Financial history COR MEIBION Y PENRHYN

Charity Number: 513178
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £81.42k £34.93k £6.32k £36.91k £53.75k
Total expenditure £80.21k £33.97k £7.68k £34.29k £43.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A