Financial history CHIEF CORNERSTONE HOUSE

Charity number: 1181230
Charity reporting is up to date (139 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £15.64k £12.93k £27.29k £13.00k £8.73k
Total expenditure £15.79k £8.15k £21.84k £13.00k £8.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A