Accounts and annual returns BETHEL INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1181909
Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 March 2023 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 March 2021 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 March 2021 59 days late Download Open in new window