Accounts and annual returns LIVING HOPE MINISTRY INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1180707
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 11 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 11 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 11 April 2025 255 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 03 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 30 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 13 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required