Accounts and annual returns ROTARY CLUB OF CASTLEFORD TRUST FUND

Charity number: 513387
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 24 June 2014 01 September 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 24 June 2014 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2013 08 December 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2013 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2012 12 December 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2012 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2011 21 December 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2011 Not Required