Trustees NONSUCH DULCIMER CLUB
Charity number: 1184249

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE ANN FITT BA | Trustee | 19 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Low Cormie | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
William James Duddy | Trustee | 30 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Hudson | Trustee | 24 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
SALLY ELIZABETH WHYTEHEAD | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.