Accounts and annual returns THE BAYWIND ENERGY COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity Number: 1185599
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 19 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 19 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 20 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 28 March 2022 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 28 July 2022 150 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 26 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 26 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window