Governing document THE FRIENDS OF SHREWSBURY MUSEUM AND ART GALLERY
Charity number: 513417

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07/12/1982 AS AMENDED ON 20/05/2004 AS AMENDED ON 19/05/2011 AS AMENDED ON 15/04/2014 as amended on 29 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE MUSEUM AND ART GALLERY ADMINISTERED BY BY SHROPSHIRE COUNCIL MUSEUM SERVICES
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.