Trustees THE FRIENDS OF THE NATIONAL ARCHIVES CIO
Charity number: 1185971

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Asha Lutchmun | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Jane Edwards | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Louise Martin | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mervyn Edward Robert Watson | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John House | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Paul Daglish | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charles Waddicor | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Toby Campbell Ewin | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harald Gunter Wollinger | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Gregory | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brian Martin Smith | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.