Financial history THE FRIENDS OF THE YORK HOSPITALS

Charity Number: 1183252
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.45k £17.97k £10.60k £40.92k £27.20k
Total expenditure £23.00k £96.65k £39.47k £102.36k £64.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A