Accounts and annual returns HINCKLEY AND DISTRICT TOY LIBRARY

Charity number: 513636
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2022 11 January 2023 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 07 January 2022 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 16 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required