Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF NYEWOOD CE JUNIOR SCHOOL

Charity number: 1182730
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 06 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 06 May 2025 310 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 06 May 2025 676 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 19 July 2022 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 19 July 2022 384 days late Download Open in new window