Financial history THE FIRST CHURCH OF GOD

Charity number: 1182506
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.12k £6.58k £6.25k £5.22k £7.18k
Total expenditure £2.95k £358 £1.60k £5.80k £4.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A