Financial history BATH PLACE COMMUNITY VENTURE LIMITED

Charity number: 513719
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £276.81k £132.80k £56.46k £21.71k £1.12k
Total expenditure £333.01k £149.10k £126.43k £29.79k £4.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A