Accounts and annual returns KAILASH NARAIN MEHROTRA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1184962
Charity reporting is up to date (89 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 April 2025 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 April 2025 89 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 April 2025 455 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 April 2025 455 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 October 2021 256 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 October 2021 256 days late Download Open in new window