Financial history SPECTRUM INC. LTD

Charity number: 1184920
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £74.17k £66.65k £66.89k £104.60k £45.80k
Total expenditure £71.95k £65.24k £81.08k £96.03k £54.20k
Income from government contracts N/A £2.66k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A