Accounts and annual returns MOHIBAAN-E-AHELABAIT TRUST

Charity number: 1185128
Charity reporting is up to date (116 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 26 March 2025 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 26 March 2025 116 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 26 March 2025 482 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 26 March 2025 482 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 28 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 19 July 2023 231 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 17 February 2022 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 05 September 2022 279 days late Download Open in new window