Financial history THE HOLWELL WORKS BENEVOLENT FUND (1983)

Charity number: 513775
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £280 £13 £12 £32 £77
Total expenditure £1.98k £25 £25 £25 £25
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A