Trustees BRITISH LYMPHOLOGY SOCIETY
Charity number: 1185148

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Malgorzata Tatar-Grycuk | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Lee Doyle | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carla Zanichelli Vives | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tamara Kosevic | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Peter Hooper-Smith | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yolande Grace Borthwick | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Victoria Hutton | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET SNEDDON | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Riches | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Hayley Elwell | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Brown | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.