Trustees THORLEY U3A
Charity number: 1182852

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Celyn Varnam | Chair | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
RYLAND PERRIN | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Linda Walpole Ketteridge | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Rosina Compton | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Mary Maxwell | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
David John Willett | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Christina Archer | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Marilla Willett | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Horsman Bailey | Trustee | 06 January 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.