Financial history SUPERPEOPLE FILMS

Charity number: 1185303
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £546 £31 £28 £3.10k £2.50k
Total expenditure £909 £1.29k £1.24k £1.30k £2.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A