Accounts and annual returns FC BLUESTAR COMMUNITY FOUNDATION CIO

Charity number: 1184381
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 03 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 26 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 15 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 26 February 2024 241 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 15 May 2023 319 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 26 February 2024 606 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 November 2022 508 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 26 February 2024 971 days late Download Open in new window