Accounts and annual returns RAY GRAY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 513943
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2011 29 November 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 04 November 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 23 December 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required