Financial history THE DURHAM COUNTY CRICKET CLUB YOUTH TRUST

Charity number: 513953
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.53k £9.80k £2.37k £9.20k £7.98k
Total expenditure £3.86k £6.13k £5.69k £15.95k £4
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A