Trustees LYTHAM ST ANNES ART SOCIETY
Charity number: 513961

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Webster | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Chantler | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Bartholomew | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline King | Trustee | 11 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Worden MA | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GRAHAM SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.