Accounts and annual returns FIRSTFRUIT INSPIRATIONAL CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity number: 1182799
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 21 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 21 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 18 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 18 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 14 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 14 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 12 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 12 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 05 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 05 March 2020 On Time Download Open in new window