Financial history JANKI ASHRAM UK

Charity number: 1185527
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £3.99k £26.83k £5.34k £6.44k
Total expenditure £0 £280 £1.13k £8.30k £12.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A