Accounts and annual returns NORTH BIRMINGHAM AND SUTTON COLDFIELD HARD OF HEARING AND DEAF ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 513991
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 02 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2007 09 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2007 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2006 19 September 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2006 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2005 Not submitted