Financial history OUTREACH COMMUNITY AND RESIDENTIAL SERVICES

Charity number: 1184970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £2.76m £2.49m £2.82m
Total expenditure £0 £0 £1.60m £2.52m £2.85m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £1.62m £2.43m £2.77m
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £80.19k £55.76k £46.02k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £1.62m £2.43m £2.77m
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £7 £309 £1.70k
Income - Other N/A N/A £1.06m £6.73k £2.70k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £1.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £1.59m £2.50m £2.83m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £12.42k £18.07k £18.51k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £8.54k £10.47k £10.65k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0