Accounts and annual returns AGE CONCERN MILLOM AND DISTRICT

Charity number: 514070
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 19 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 21 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 06 December 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 06 December 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 16 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 16 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 23 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 23 November 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 20 September 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 20 September 2004 On Time