Trustees 2ND CALVERLEY (PARISH CHURCH) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 514091

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Helen Mulligan | Chair | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Frances Dakin | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kate Louise Questa | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Nutter | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Ward Jones | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tal-at Amreen Kapasi-chawke | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAMES NAYLOR | Trustee | 16 September 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.