Financial history AVON NEEDS TREES

Charity number: 1184386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 11/07/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £516.99k £335.12k £219.71k £765.19k £4.82m
Total expenditure £8.00k £77.90k £169.56k £311.26k £583.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.18k £99.83k £681.68k £4.38m
Income - Donations and legacies £276.77k N/A N/A £764.36k £266.26k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £240.20k N/A N/A £0 £4.55m
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £19 N/A N/A £827 £2.76k
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.09k N/A N/A £100.56k £579.60k
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.91k N/A N/A £109 £3.91k
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A £1.80k £9.96k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A £210.60k £0