Accounts and annual returns THE ADVANTAGE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE

Charity number: 1184752
Charity reporting is overdue by 838 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 838 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 838 days
Annual return 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 05 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 05 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window