Financial history HUNWICK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 514200
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011
Total gross income £27.13k £8.79k £21.76k £15.19k £13.85k
Total expenditure £23.98k £9.97k £13.97k £9.36k £5.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A