Accounts and annual returns GARSTON C E PRIMARY SCHOOL TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 514321
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 September 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 01 September 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 01 September 2015 24 November 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2015 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2014 24 November 2015 146 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2014 Not Required