Accounts and annual returns HOGGIES RESPITE

Charity number: 1185856
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 25 September 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 07 October 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 October 2021 On Time