Accounts and annual returns CATS (LEEDS) LIMITED

Charity Number: 514377
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 17 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 19 August 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 20 May 2010 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 14 July 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required