Financial history PHOENIX RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1184039
Charity reporting is up to date (104 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £2.32k £4.87k £3.55k £3.36k £20.16k
Total expenditure £1.70k £4.89k £3.01k £3.59k £17.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.00k