Trustees CYLCH MEITHRIN A TI A FI GLAN Y FFERI

Charity number: 1185651
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Laura Thomas Chair 22 November 2018
None on record
Lewis Eldred Davies Trustee 12 December 2024
None on record
Karis Christina Randall Trustee 11 April 2022
None on record
Catrin Elen Griffiths Trustee 11 April 2022
None on record
Jenifer Stephens Trustee 25 February 2020
None on record
Leah Bonnell Trustee 22 November 2018
None on record
Katie Hayhurst Trustee 22 November 2017
None on record