Governing document ALL SAINTS HAQUE CENTRE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 OCTOBER 1981 AS AMENDED 2 NOVEMBER 1983 AND 14 MARCH 1984 AND 26 JUNE 1986 AND 25 JUNE 1987
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE PROJECT AREA (THE AREA OF WOLVERHAMPTON BOUNDED BY AND INCLUDING, STEELHOUSE LANE, CLEVELAND ROAD, BIRMINGHAM NEW ROAD AND ALL SAINTS ROAD). AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS AND REFLECTING SOME OF THE SEPARATE AS WELL AS SHARED, SOCIAL, EDUCATIONAL AND CULTURAL NEEDS AND INTRESTS OF THE VARIOUS ETHNIC GROUPS PRESENT IN THE AREA.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.