Accounts and annual returns WEST PENNINE MUSIC FESTIVAL

Charity Number: 514616
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2005 08 March 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2004 17 August 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2004 Not Required