Accounts and annual returns RAVENFIELD COMMUNITY PLAN GROUP (RCPG)

Charity number: 1188553
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 03 February 2024 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 03 February 2024 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 10 February 2023 10 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window