Accounts and annual returns THE LIFE OF RILEY APPEAL LIMITED

Charity number: 1190081
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 22 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 22 December 2024 360 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 22 December 2024 725 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 29 March 2022 91 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required