Accounts and annual returns RUGELEY OLD CHANCEL PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1186583
Charity reporting is overdue by 825 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 15 April 2025 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 94 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 29 January 2025 359 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 460 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 13 April 2023 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 825 days
Annual return 05 April 2021 07 October 2022 244 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 18 October 2022 255 days late Download Open in new window