Financial history DOLGELLAU INSTITUTE (KNOWN LOCALLY AS THE FREE LIBRARY)

Charity number: 514712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £40.01k £60.94k £108.19k £27.47k £32.66k
Total expenditure £24.19k £63.37k £150.08k £22.11k £15.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £38.00k £47.00k £107.99k £25.00k £27.72k