Trustees GIRSBY AND OVER DINSDALE VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 514740

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Robinson | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
May Ying Frost | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Murray | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Horton | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Denis Murray | Trustee | 14 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anita Turnbull | Trustee | 06 May 1989 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.