Accounts and annual returns JOB AID

Charity number: 1188599
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2022 14 February 2023 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 14 February 2023 14 days late
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 04 September 2021 On Time