Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF ST MARTIN BRADLEY
Charity number: 1185510
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Cathryn Dawn Watson | Chair | 03 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Annette Jacqueline Duckworth | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Jayne Russell | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Ann Bhella | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew James Aldridge | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Edkins | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carene Anne Spooner | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Robinson | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Simon Walter Grennan | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth May Thomas | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Clare Grennan | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.