Accounts and annual returns PAKJAZBBA

Charity number: 1187347
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 October 2024 360 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 25 October 2024 360 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 October 2024 725 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 25 October 2024 725 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 November 2021 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 15 November 2021 15 days late Download Open in new window