Accounts and annual returns PHOENIX DANCE & GYMNASTICS

Charity number: 1186800
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 11 February 2025 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 11 February 2025 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 10 April 2024 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 10 April 2024 65 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 27 February 2023 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 25 May 2023 109 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 05 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 05 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window